# gkrecall

We brings you daily Current affairs, daily Current Affairs Quiz, weekly Current Affairs, weekly Current Affairs Quiz to enhance your preparation for upcoming exams. We also provide articles related to quant, reasoning, English, ssc etc .

## Breaking

Approximation Questions For Ibps Po and Clerk Prelim

SBI Clerk and SBI PO Prelims exam are going to be held in the upcoming months. We have already provided you with the PDFs of many topics of Quantitative Aptitude like Simplification/Approximation, Number Series,datainterpretation.important Arithmetic questions to prepare for SBI Clerk and PO Pre exam. Practicing these questions will help you to know about the level of the questions. To increase your speed and accuracy, enhance your calculations.

Web

START QUIZ

1) 3240 ÷ 30 * 15 =? * 16

a) 104

b) 101

c) 105

d) 106

d) 110

2) 61% of 985 – 151.046 =? – 63% of 698

a) 860

b) 880

c) 830

d) 850

e) 890

3) (447.68/32) ÷ (19.23/778.69) * (227.54/76) =?

a) 51

b) 54

c) 55

d) 58

e) 49

4) 1234.67 + 657.009 + 89.763 + 452.987 + 6753.099 =?

a) 9188

b) 9288

c) 8788

d) 8188

e) 9648

5) √7398 * √11025 + √627 =? – √731

a) 8082

b) 7982

c) 9082

d) 9882

e) 9152

6.34.99% of 499.896 + 27.99% of 1250.013 = 8 × ?

A.66

B.42

C.31

D.20

E.81

7) 89.90 * 6.06 + 56.05 % of 399.90 – √3720.898 * 4.09 + ? = 79.906 * 6.99

A) 50

B) 60

C) 40

D) 20

E) None of these

8) 23.90 % of 75.09 + 12.12 * 31.13 + 119.08 ÷ √289.098 = ?

A) 367

B) 377

C) 387

D) 397

E) None of these

9) 114.90 % of 19.908 + 189.90 * 5.99 – √1521.09 ÷ √8.909 = ?

A) 1120

B) 1130

C) 1150

D) 1170

E) None of these

10) 55.55 % of 654.90+18.18 % of 230.98 + 54.54 % of 198.087 = ? + 289.90

A) 180

B) 220

C) 260

D) 290

E) None of these

11.  324.99 of 48.07% =?

1) 162

2)156

3) 174

4) 138

5) 144

12. 38.93 × 112.67 + 223.854 × 17.893 =?

1)8340

2)8430

3)8450

4)8440

5)8450

13. 945.11 ÷ 34.98 × 20.054 =?

1)413

2)527

3) 365

4)619

5) 567

14. (18.79)² × √730 =?

1)9570

2)9750

3)9700

4)9500

5)10500

15. (16.072)² + (22.202)² + (35.986)² + (38.8761)² =?

1)3560

2)3650

3)3750

4)3570

5)3590

16. 72.35 × 190 + 26 × 13.5 – 110 × 24.5 =?

1)11490

2)11370

3)11580

4)11290

5)11670

17. 49.8% of 579.88 – 529.78% of 540 + 4451.887 =?

1)1880

2) 1460

3)1360

4)1580

5) 1790

18. (42.42)² + (39.549)² – (11.764)² – (45.47)² =?

1) 1010

2)1195

3)2155

4)2210

5)2020

19. 32.23% of 624.699 + 49.876% of 650.112 + 2574.98 =?

1)4200

2)3100

3)2700

4)1750

5)5100

20. 487.532 + 2849.029 – 675.48 = 743.095 + ?

1)1900

2)1800

3)1820

4)1900

5)1920

21. (630 +?) x 26 = 2860

1)120

2)260

3)520

4)315

5)290

22. 61.33% of 700 – 450.17 = ? – 85% of 1020

a) 890

2) 820

3)910

4) 830

5) 1040

23.√6578 × √4330÷ √730 = ?

1) 171

2)151

3)191

4)161

5)201

SOLUTIONS:

? * 16 = (3240/30) * 15

? * 16 = 3240/2

? = 101(approx)

61% of 985 – 151.046 =? – 63% of 698

60/100 * 985 – 151 =? – 63/100 * 700

591 – 151 =? – 441

? = 881 = 880 (Approx.)

? = (448/32) * (779/19) * (228/76)

? = 14 + 41 + 3

? = 58

1234.67 + 657.009 + 89.763 + 452.987 + 6753.099 =?

1235 + 657 + 90 + 453 + 6753 =?

9188 =?

√7398 * √11025 + √627 =? – √731

√7396 * √11025 + √625 =? – √729

86 * 105 + 25 =? – 27

9030 + 25 + 27 =?

9082 =?

6.Correct Option: A

34.99% of 499.896 + 27.99% of 1250.013 = 8 × ?

8 × ≈ (35 / 100) × 500 + (28 / 100) × 1250

8 × ? ≈ 175 + 350

? ≈ (252 / 8) = 65.625

? ≈ 66

Hence, option A is correct.

540+224-244+?=560

?=40

18+372+7=?

397=?

23+1140-13=?

1150=?

360+42+108=?+290

220=?

Ans 11. 2

325 × (48/100) =?

? = 156

Ans 12. 4

39 × 113 + 224 × 18 =?

4407 + 4032 =?

? = 8439

Ans 13. 5

945 ÷ 35 × 21 =?

27 × 21 =?

? = 567

Ans 14. 2

(19)² × √730 =?

361 × 27 =?

? = 9747

Ans 15. 1

(16)² + (22)² + (36)² + (39)² =?

256 + 484 + 1296 + 1521 =?

? = 3557

Ans 16. 4

72 × 190 + 26 × 14 – 110 × 25 =?

13680 + 364 – 2750 =?

? = 11294

Ans 17. 1

290 – 2862 + 4452 =?

? = 1880

Ans 18. 2

(42)² + (40)² – (12)² – (45)² =?

1764 + 1600 – 144 – 2025 =?

3364 – 2169 =?

?= 1195

Ans 19. 2

32% of 625 + 50% of 650 + 2575 =?

200 + 325 + 2575 =?

? = 3100

Ans 20. 2

(425 ÷ 12.5 +?³) ÷ 30 = 12(1/2)

(34 + ?³) ÷ 30 = (25/2)

34 + ?³ = 375

?³ = 341

? = 7 approx

Ans 21. 5

488 + 2849 – 675 = 743 +?

? = 1919

Ans 23. 3

(630 +?) = 2860/26

(630 +?) = 110

? = 520

Ans 22. 1

61% of 700 – 450 =? – 85% of 1020

427 – 450 =? – 867

? = 890

Ans 23. 5

(81 x 67)/27 =?

? = 201